Home / Study & Brain Power / Vedic Maths Tricks for students

Vedic Maths Tricks for students

DOWNLOAD VEDIC MATHS PDFs HERE:

Vedic_Maths.pdf

vedic_maths_original.pdf

Vedic_Maths_Tutorial__interactive.pdf


 

What is Vedic Maths?

Vedic Mathematics is a super fast way of calculation whereby you can do supposedly complex calculations like 998 x 997 in less than five seconds flat. It is highly beneficial for school and college students and students who are appearing for their entrance examinations.

Vedic Mathematics is far more systematic, simplified and unified than the conventional system. It is a mental tool for calculation that encourages the development and use of intuition and innovation, while giving the student a lot of flexibility, fun and satisfaction. For your child, it means giving them a competitive edge, a way to optimize their performance and gives them an edge in mathematics and logic that will help them to shine in the classroom and beyond.

Therefore it’s direct and easy to implement in schools – a reason behind its enormous popularity among academicians and students

It complements the Mathematics curriculum conventionally taught in schools by acting as a powerful checking tool and goes to save precious time in examinations.The methods & techniques are based on the pioneering work of late Swami Shri Bharati Krishna Tirthaji, Sankracharya of Puri, who established the system from the study of ancient Vedic texts coupled with a profound insight into the natural process of mathematical reasoning.

There are just 16 Sutras or Formulae which solve all known mathematical problems in the branches of Arithmetic, Algebra, Geometry and Calculus. They are easy to understand, easy to apply and easy to remember.

vedic

Benefits of Vedic Maths?

  • Eliminates math-phobia.
  • Increases speed and accuracy.
  • More systematic, simplified, unified & faster than the conventional system.
  • Gives the student flexibility, fun and
    immense satisfaction
  • powerful checking tool.
  • Saves precious time in examinations.
  • Gives the student a competitive edge.
  • Develops Left & Right Sides of the brains
    by increasing visualization and
    concentration
     abilities.

Some Vedic Maths Tricks 

Trick 1 : Multiply any two numbers from 11 to 20 in your head.
Take 15 × 13 for example… Place the larger no. first in your mind and then do something like this Take the larger no on the top and the second digit of the smaller no. in the bottom.
15
3
The rest is quite simple. Add 15+3 = 18 . Then multiply 18 × 10 = 180 …
Now multiply the second digit of both the no.s (ie; 5 × 3 = 15) Now add 180 + 15Here is the answer 180 + 15 = 195 . Think over it. This is a simple trick. It will help you a lot.

Trick 2 : Multiply any two digit number with 11.

This trick is much simpler than the previous one and it is more useful too. Let the number be 27 . Therefore 27 × 11
Divide the number as 2 _ 7
Add 2+ 7 = 9
Thus the answer is 2 9 7
Wasn’t this one simple. But there is one complication. If you take a number like 57 Thus 5_7 x 11
Divide the number as 5 _ 7
Add 5 + 7 = 12
Now add 1 to 5 and place 2 in the middle so the answer is 5+1_2 _7 = _627
Thus the answer is 627.

Trick 3: Square a two digit number ending in five. This one is as easy as the previous ones but you have to pay a little more attention to this one . Read carefully :Let the number be 35
35 × 35
Multiply the last digits of both the numbers ; thus ___ 5 × 5 = 25
now add 1 to 3 thus 3 + 1 = 4
multiply 4 × 3 = 12
thus answer 1225

You will have to think over this one carefully.As 5 has to come in the end so the last two digits o the answer will be 25 . Add 1 to the first digit and multiply it by the original first digit . Now this answer forms the digits before the 25. Thus we get an answer.

Trick 4 : Square any two digit number.

Suppose the number is 47 . Look for the nearest multiple of 10 . ie; in this case 50. We will reach 50 if we add 3 to 47. So multiply (47+3) x (47-3) = 50 × 44 = 2200 This is the 1st interim answer.


We had added 3 to reach the nearest multiple of 10 that is 50 thus 3x 3 = 9 This is the second interim answer.

The final answer is 2200 + 9 = 2209 … Practice This one on paper first.


Trick 5
 : Multiply any number by 11 .

Trick number 2 tells you how to multiply a two digit number by 11 but what if you have a number like 12345678. Well that is very easy if you our trick as given below. Read it carefully.


Let the number be 12345678 __ thus 12345678 × 11


Write down the number as 012345678 ( Add a 0 in the beginning)

Now starting from the units digit write down the numbers after adding the number to the right, so the answer will be 135802458

This one is simple if you think over it properly all you got to do is to add the number on the right . If you are getting a carry over then add that
to the number on the left. So I will tell you how I got the answer . Read carefully. The number was 12345678 ___ I put a 0 before the number ____ so the new number 012345678 Now I wrote ___ 012345678


Then for the answer

8 + 0 = 8

7 + 8 = 15 (1 gets carry carried over)

6+1+7 = 14 ( 1 gets carried over)

5 + 1 + 6 = 12 ( 1 gets carried over)

4 + 1 + 5 = 10 ( 1 gets carried over)

3 + 1 + 4 = 8

2 + 3 = 5

1 + 2 = 3

0 + 1 = 1

Thus the answer = 135802458

Trick 6 : Square a 2 Digit Number, for this example 37:
Look for the nearest 10 boundary
In this case up 3 from 37 to 40.
Since you went UP 3 to 40 go DOWN 3 from 37 to 34.
Now mentally multiply 34×40
The way I do it is 34×10=340;
Double it mentally to 680
Double it again mentally to 1360
This 1360 is the FIRST interim answer.
37 is “3” away from the 10 boundary 40.
Square this “3” distance from 10 boundary.
3×3=9 which is the SECOND interim answer.
Add the two interim answers to get the final answer.
Answer: 1360 + 9 = 1369

With practice this can easily be done in your head.

 

6 comments

  1. Vedic Maths- A multiplication like 109 x 106 could be solved in less than five seconds by a third grader which usually takes little more than two minutes to solve.It speeds up the calculations and simplify the learning process.

    Website- http://www.magicved.com/tricks/

  2. Vedic maths is nothing but simplified pure algebra. U said 109 x 106, according to algebra, it can be broken into (x+a)(x+b) = x^2 + x(a+b) + ab, here x = 100, a= 9, b= 6, so he answer becomes, 10000 + 1500 + 54 = 11554. Many other vedic tricks are also algebra.

  3. Baria Yogeshkumar madhavsinh

    Nice tricks for maths fast calculated

    More tricks given me please
    My gmail

  4. very easy to understanding and improve talents nice thank you sir

  5. more tricks sent my email sir

  6. More tricks sent my email sir .thank you sir

Leave a Reply

Your email address will not be published. Required fields are marked *

*